In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company, John Does 1 - 10, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
In Re: All Defendants (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY), All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY), Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee
Interested Party: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Ms. Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard
Case Number: 2:2019md02887
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Adam M. Tamburelli as to Jun Virginia Sun-Dampier. (Tamburelli, Adam)
February 19, 2020 Filing 70 REPLY Memorandum Regarding Coordination/Consolidation of This Action by Plaintiff Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard. (Originally filed in case 19-2672 DE #27)(gw)
February 19, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY to both #67 Response by Interested Party and #53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track and Coordination of the Eichhorn-Burkhard Matter by All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY). (Schwartz, Rachel)
February 19, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr re: #53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Schwarz, Ashlea)
February 5, 2020 Filing 67 RESPONSE by Interested Party Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard Regarding Coordination/Consolidation of this Action in Response to the Court's December 11, 2019 Order. (Originally filed in case 19-2672 DE #26) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(hw)
February 5, 2020 Filing 66 Defendants' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Consolidating the Eichhorn-Burkhard Complaint Into the Existing MDL by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Originally filed in case 19-2672 DE #25) (hw)
February 5, 2020 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by All Plaintiffs re: #53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track, and Memorandum Regarding Consolidation of the Eichhorn-Burkhard Matter. (Schwartz, Rachel)
February 5, 2020 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. re: #53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track. (Schult, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that the stay of discovery is continued. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before ten (10) days from the date on which the Court issues a ruling on the Motion to Establish a Separate Litigation Track. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/5/2020. (hw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 62 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Murphy on behalf of Harold Infante. (Murphy, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 61 JOINT STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The stay of discovery is continued until 02/03/2020. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 02/03/2020. The response deadline regarding #53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track is extended to 2/5/2020, with any reply due 2/19/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson, and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 01/22/2020. (mg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE to #58 Status Report by MDL - Notice Only Jennifer Jubinville, W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schwarz, Ashlea)
January 21, 2020 Filing 58 JOINT STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Court continues the stay of discovery until January 21, 2020 as requested, and the parties shall file a joint status report on or before that date.(See Order for details.) Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/9/2020. (bw)
January 8, 2020 Filing 56 JOINT STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule for the Establish a Separate Litigation Track, signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/23/2019. Any response to the Motion shall be due on or before January 22, 2020, the same date that briefing is due regarding the Eichhorn-Burkhard case. To the extent that any reply is necessary in either Eichhorn-Burkhard or with respect to the Motion to establish a separate litigation track, such reply shall be due on or before February 5, 2020. (bw) Modified on 12/24/2019 to correct title of document (bw).
December 20, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Order (Briefing Schedule) by All Plaintiffs. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Schwartz, Rachel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Establish a Separate Litigation Track by MDL by W. Allan Schwegmann, Jr. and Jenna Sprengel. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
December 16, 2019 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference (32 pgs) held 12/11/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Thomas Schult. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (ks)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Eichhorn-Burkhard case (Case No. 19-2672-JAR-TJJ) is hereby stayed for all purposes except briefing on the issue of coordination and/or consolidation with the MDL until further notice of the Court. See order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/11/2019. (bw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2019. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
December 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Texas Fontenot v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00594, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #49 Conditional Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02736-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 49 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/3/19. (hw)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER and NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. All counsel who wish to participate in this telephonic status conference are instructed to dial into the conference line. The CONFERENCE LINE is 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(bw)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF DISCOVERY until January 8, 2020 re #46 Status Report and #2 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/8/2019. (ck)
November 8, 2019 Filing 46 JOINT STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Rosemary Medellin Rivas. (Rivas, Rosemary)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/10/2019. (gw)
October 10, 2019 Filing 43 ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) PROTOCOL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/10/2019. (mn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Pursuant to the Status Report filed on 9/19/2019 #41 , the status conference set for September 26, 2019 at 10:30 AM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 41 Joint STATUS REPORT for September 26, 2019 Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing (TIME ONLY): THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the time has changed for the status conference currently set for 9/26/2019 to 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Sharon Manier.(Godino, Marc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference (40 pages) held 08/19/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson and Judge Teresa J. James, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Thomas Schult. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2019. (ks)
August 22, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Protocols for Time and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by William Albion. (Young, Joshua)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (bw)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 1: Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. See Order for a summary of deadlines and settings. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2019. (bw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. In-Person SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2019. Plaintiffs appear by their counsel, Gary Mason, Michael Reese, Rachel Schwartz and Scott Kamber. Defendants appear by Richard Goetz, Thomas Schult and Jennifer Weiland. Following discussions, and for reasons set out more specifically on the record, the Court sets a status conference for 9/26/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are to submit to the Court by 9/20/2019 a status report indicating whether or not a status conference is still needed on 9/26/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER TO FOLLOW. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2019. (mn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Patricia Niemann. (Hammond, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 30 Third Amended NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT for August 19, 2019 Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Rachel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 Amended NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Lisa Lavalle. (Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Relates to Kansas case #19-2313-JAR-TJJ; Lavalle v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al)
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 Second Amended NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin)(Document is not correctly case captioned. (mg)) (Relates to Kansas case #19-2327-JAR-TJJ; Donna Connary v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Lisa Lavalle. (Sarnelli, Jennifer) (Document is not correctly case captioned. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 Amended NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Donna Connary. (Blakeman, Benjamin)(Document is not correctly case captioned. (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Donna Connary.(Blakeman, Benjamin) (Document is not correctly case captioned. (mg)
August 2, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings of the Same Type: Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James and Chief Judge Julie A Robinson (this entry was made to place the hearing on the calendar for both judges).(cs)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE of UPCOMING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. AMENDED TO ADD MAGISTRATE TERESA J. JAMES AND CORRECT COURTROOM. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE FOR UPCOMING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING a Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of Initial Conference (142 pgs) held 07/29/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Judge Teresa J. James, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Thomas Schult. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2019. (ks)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL: Appointing Richard B. Goetz and Thomas P. Schult as Defendants' Lead and Liaison Counsel. Appointing Gary E. Mason, Rachel E. Schwartz, Michael R. Reese, and Scott A. Kamber for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. Appointing Rachel E. Schwartz as Liaison Counsel for All Plaintiffs. Appointing Melissa R. Emert, Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg, Rosemary Medellin Rivas, and Charles E. Schaffer for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee and Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/31/2019. (gw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Theresa J. James: INITIAL CONFERENCE regarding the organizational structure of plaintiffs' counsel held on 7/29/2019. ORDER TO FOLLOW. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick as to Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel. (Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Dennis C. Costigan as to Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel. (Costigan, Dennis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Isaac L. Diel as to All Plaintiffs. (Diel, Isaac)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Vincent L. Greene as to Kelli Coppi, Laura Freeman, Jennifer Jubinville, Jenna Sprengel. (Greene, Vincent)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE OF AGENDA FOR JULY 29, 2019 INITIAL CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF SECOND HEARING DATE: Status Report due by 8/12/2019. Second Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 655 (KC) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/24/2019. (bw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE LINE FOR UPCOMING INITIAL CONFERENCE ON 7/29/2019: An in-person Initial Conference is set for 7/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom #655. A telephone conference line will be available for interested counsel and parties to listen in on this hearing. Participants on the phone line will NOT be able to participate in the hearing, only listen in. To join the conference line, interested participants shall dial into the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and the ACCESS CODE is 4697748#. Participants will follow the instructions to join the call. (bw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-4054, Dicroce v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #11 ). (gw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Dicroce v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-4054-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/11/2019. (ses)
July 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2360, Boggio v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #10 ). (gw)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Boggio v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2360-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/08/2019. (ses)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Mary Pat Dwyer of O'Melveny & Myers LLP as to Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2345, Blaser et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #8 ). (gw)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Blaser, et al. v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2345-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/27/2019. (ses)
June 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Tennessee Chapman et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00070, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02333-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2181, Teegarden v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #7 ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Teegarden v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2181-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/20/2019. (ses)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2206, Rider et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #6 ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2171, Hess v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #6 ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2308, Niemann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #6 ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2110, Brown v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #6 ). (gw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Brown v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2110-JAR-TJJ; Niemann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2308-JAR-TJJ; Hess v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2171-JAR-TJJ; and Rider, et al. v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2206-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/20/2019. (ses)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Pennsylvania Skoog et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-01421, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02331-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Louisiana Conley v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-04363, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02330-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Central District of California Georgeanne Hall v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-01423, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02329-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Central District of California William Albion v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00935, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02326-JAR-TJJ).
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Central District of California Donna Connary v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00913, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02327-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Central District of California Sharon Manier v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-04248, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02328-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2121, Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #5 ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2149, Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #5 ). (gw)
June 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2118, Johnson et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #5 ). (gw)
June 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2295, Salazar v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #5 ). (gw)
June 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original record from District of Kansas, Case 19-2135, Alberto et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, has been received pursuant to Order (Doc. #5 ). (gw)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Ana Alberto v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2135-JAR-TJJ; Oscar Salazar v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2295-JAR-TJJ;Kristina Johnson and Cliff Palifrone v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2118-JAR-TJJ; Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2149-JAR-TJJ; and David Johnson, Angelina Raines, and Kayla Vanwinsen v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2121-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/18/2019. (ses)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Southern District of New York Jacoby-Hale v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-04951, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02325-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Colorado Infante v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-01502, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02323-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Southern District of Ohio Flanary et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00243, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02322-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York Reed v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-02225, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02314-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York Kra v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-01444, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02315-JAR-TJJ).
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Western District of Pennsylvania McIlvaine v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00497, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1). (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02320-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from New Jersey Sahli et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-09239, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02319-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York Lavalle v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-02971, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #4 Conditional Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02313-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Northern District of California Navarette v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00767, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02312-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Northern District of California Sun-Dampier v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00831, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02310-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Northern District of California Bauer et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00908, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02311-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/14/19. (hw)
June 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Rhode Island Jubinville, et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00074, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02303-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from the Northern District of Florida, Russell et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00395, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02285-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of New York, Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., et al, Case #19-00831, received pursuant to MDL 2887 #1 Transfer Order. (Case Number assigned in the District of Kansas: #19-cv-02284-JAR-TJJ). (gw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AMENDING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DATE AND OTHER DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE #2 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order. Corporate Disclosure Statement due July 15, 2019. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 7/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Special Proceedings Courtroom 655 (KC) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Any proposals as to agenda items or proposed case management orders shall be submitted by 7/15/2019. Any counsel interested in seeking a leadership role in the organizational structure must appear at the initial scheduling conference and also must submit, no later than 7/15/2019, a proposal by email to Judges Robinson and James. Written statements are due by 7/22/2019. See this Order for chambers email addresses. The Court is issuing this Order only to amend the foregoing deadlines and has omitted from this Order crucial information and instructions included in the June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order, including information and instructions for the submissions required by the dates set forth above. All other provisions of the June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order remain in full force and effect, and counsel are cautioned to thoroughly review the entirety of that Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/11/2019. (bw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Corporate disclosure statements due by 06/27/2019. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 07/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Special Proceedings Courtroom 655 (KC) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Any proposals as to agenda items or proposed case management orders, shall be submitted by 06/27/2019. Any counsel interested in seeking a leadership role in the organizational structure must appear at the initial scheduling conference and also must submit, no later than 06/27/2019, a proposal by email to Judges Robinson and James. Written statements are due by 07/03/2019. See this Order for chambers email addresses. The District Court of Kansas is an electronic court and the parties must submit all filings electronically unless otherwise ordered by the court. Counsel are required to register for electronic filing through their individual PACER account. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(ses)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(hw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: All Defendants (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)
Represented By: Richard B. Goetz
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Scott A. Kamber
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Plaintiffs' Executive Committee
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Rosemary Medellin Rivas
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Luthi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ms. Diana Anja Eichhorn-Burkhard
Represented By: Michael D. Murphy
Represented By: Brian Hanlin
Represented By: Ari Y. Basser
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Daniel K. Back
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Franklin D. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Richard B. Goetz
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Amy J. Laurendeau
Represented By: Gerard A. Savaresse
Represented By: Allen W. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Richard B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?