Isberner v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Isberner
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02001
Filed: January 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Goldsmith, Mark)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Deadline to submit Report of Parties Planning Meeting 3/13/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/13/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/13/2020. (aw)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/12/2020 for Defendant Walmart Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/29/2020. (ca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Susan Isberner upon Walmart Inc. served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020 (McInnes, Jack)
January 6, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 1, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Susan Isberner. (McInnes, Jack)
January 1, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Susan Isberner - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McInnes, Jack)
January 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5018762.), filed by Susan Isberner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter)(McInnes, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isberner v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Isberner
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Pamela Nagel Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?