Linhart v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane E. Linhart
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM via Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. (ht)
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Trans Union LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Trans Union LLC. (Mouber, Bryan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Webb, Danne)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Jane E. Linhart. (Stecklein, Alan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint Answer and Defenses by Trans Union LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/05/2020. (ses)
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jane E. Linhart.(Stecklein, Alan)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric A. Nicholson for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Eric A. Nicholson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5031440.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(Webb, Danne)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/11/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/15/2020. (mls)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Trans Union LLC(Mouber, Bryan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Trans Union LLC (Mouber, Bryan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Experian plc as corporate parent (Webb, Danne)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Webb, Danne)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Jane E. Linhart. (Stecklein, Alan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Trans Union LLC of Notice of Removal (Mouber, Bryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Mouber, Bryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2019-LM-005932 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5020393.), filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mouber, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linhart v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E. Linhart
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Eric A. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?