Continental Cast Stone, LLC v. Story et al
Plaintiff: Continental Cast Stone, LLC
Defendant: G. Shelby Story and Story Cast Stone, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02026
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ydm)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Continental Cast Stone, LLC (Parrish, Mark)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2020. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/28/2020. (smc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against All Defendants filed by Continental Cast Stone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (ydm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 **DOCUMENT FILED INCORRECTLY SEE DOC #11 FOR CORRECTION** AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against All Plaintiffs, filed by Continental Cast Stone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parrish, Mark)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Continental Cast Stone, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3)(Parrish, Mark)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Continental Cast Stone, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(Parrish, Mark)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No later than 2/3/2020, Plaintiff Continental Cast Stone, LLC is required to show good cause in writing to U.S. District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/17/2020. (ts)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Continental Cast Stone, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Parrish, Mark)
January 16, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to G. Shelby Story, Story Cast Stone, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 16, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Continental Cast Stone, LLC. (Parrish, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Cast Stone, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Parrish, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5031832.), filed by Continental Cast Stone, LLC.(Parrish, Mark). (#1 Exhibit) (Parrish, Mark).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Cast Stone, LLC v. Story et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Shelby Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Story Cast Stone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Cast Stone, LLC
Represented By: Mark Everett Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?