Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC v Ryser et al
Debtor: Michael Ryser and Carol Ann Ryser
Garnishee: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Not Classified By Court: Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02069
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #11 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(mam)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (AMENDED) by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Taylor, Andrea)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Taylor, Andrea)
March 18, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 MOTION to Quash Order of Garnishment MOTION to Dismiss Proceeding under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and/or 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ks)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Quash Order of Garnishment MOTION to Dismiss Proceeding under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and/or 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Garnishee Federal Emergency Management Agency(Taylor, Andrea)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Order of Garnishment ( Response deadline 3/31/2020), MOTION to Dismiss Proceeding under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5), and/or 12(b)(6) ( Response deadline 4/7/2020), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response deadline 4/7/2020), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 4/7/2020) by Garnishee Federal Emergency Management Agency (Taylor, Andrea)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from Johnson County District Court. (Taylor, Andrea)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for the United States to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Garnishor's Order of Garnishment. The United States, on behalf of the Federal Emergency Management Agency, shall have until March 17, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the garnishor's order of garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/4/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Garnishor's Order of Garnishment by Garnishee Federal Emergency Management Agency (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Taylor, Andrea)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by Federal Emergency Management Agency re #3 Designation of Place of Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal. (Taylor, Andrea)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Garnishee Federal Emergency Management Agency - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Taylor, Andrea)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Garnishee Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Taylor, Andrea)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 18 CV 2068 Trial location of Kansas City, filed by Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC v Ryser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Michael Ryser
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Carol Ann Ryser
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: Andrea L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?