G. et al v. Shawnee Mission School District USD 512 et al
Plaintiff: S. G.
Defendant: Teddi Pendland, Crystal Smith, Shawnee Mission School District USD 512 and Heather Ousley
Case Number: 2:2020cv02078
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/14/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/14/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/1/2020. (ss)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot #17 Motion to Stay Case pursuant to Order of Dismissal of Defendants Ousley and Pendland #20 . Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS Heather Ousley (Shawnee Mission School District USD 512, Board of Education President) and Teddi Pendland. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/31/2020. (smc)
March 31, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Defendants Ousley and Pendland by S. G.. (Zmijewski, Daniel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff S. G. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Heather Ousley STIPULATING TO DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT (Zmijewski, Daniel)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Teddi Pendland (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Goheen, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Party Teddi Pendland by Defendant Teddi Pendland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Goheen, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Party Teddi Pendland by Defendant Teddi Pendland (Goheen, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 Separate ANSWER to Complaint by Crystal Smith.(Durbin, James)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Shawnee Mission School District USD 512.(Goheen, Gregory)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion for a one-day extension to March 10, 2020, for defendant Unified School District No. 512 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Shawnee Mission School District USD 512 (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Goheen, Gregory)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Heather Ousley by Defendant Heather Ousley(Goheen, Gregory)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Heather Ousley by Defendant Heather Ousley (Goheen, Gregory)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/16/2020 for Defendant Teddi Pendland to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/28/2020. (ca)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from Johnson County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Goheen, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/16/2020 for Defendant Crystal Smith to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/26/2020. (ca)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/9/2020 for Defendants Heather Ousley, Shawnee Mission School District USD 512 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/24/2020. (ca)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Heather Ousley, Teddi Pendland, Shawnee Mission Unified School District No. 512 (Goheen, Gregory)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James A. Durbin on behalf of Crystal Smith (Durbin, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Crystal Smith re #1 Notice of Removal, / Defendant Crystal Smith's Consent and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Durbin, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 2020CV000513 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5069444.), filed by Heather Ousley, Shawnee Mission Unified School District No. 512, Teddi Pendland. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goheen, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. et al v. Shawnee Mission School District USD 512 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. G.
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddi Pendland
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Smith
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission School District USD 512
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Ousley
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?