Corbezzolo v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Corbezzolo
Defendant: Augustus C. Griffin, MGP Ingredients, Inc. and Brandon M. Gall
Petitioner: City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Case Number: 2:2020cv02090
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by Movant City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan K. Meyer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Notice of Pendency of Corbezzolo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D: Notice of Pendency of City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E: BLBG Resume)(Meyer, Ryan)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by Movant City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Meyer, Ryan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen Corbezzolo. Brandon M. Gall waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; Augustus C. Griffin waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020; MGP Ingredients, Inc. waiver sent on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Schwartz, Rachel)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shawn A. Williams,Daniel J. Pfefferbaum for Stephen Corbezzolo pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Shawn A. Williams and Daniel J. Pfefferbaum to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $100, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5083717.) by Plaintiff Stephen Corbezzolo (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shawn A. Williams, #2 ECF Registration Form, #3 Affidavit of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Schwartz, Rachel)
March 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brandon M. Gall, Augustus C. Griffin, MGP Ingredients, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Stephen Corbezzolo. (Schwartz, Rachel)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5074965.), filed by Stephen Corbezzolo. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Securities Laws)(Schwartz, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbezzolo v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustus C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGP Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Corbezzolo
Represented By: Norman Eli Siegel
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Daniel J. Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Represented By: Ryan K. Meyer
Represented By: David G. Seely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?