Lugo et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Javier Lugo and Raquel Larrea Pereda
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02095
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant United States' Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant United States of America shall have until July 3, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/22/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suenram, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN WRONG CASE***FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number K4631058665. (ca) Modified on 3/19/2020 (ca).
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Javier Lugo - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Moore, Lee)
March 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service) (ca)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Javier Lugo. (Moore, Lee)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5076791.), filed by Javier Lugo.(Moore, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Lugo
Represented By: Lee A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Larrea Pereda
Represented By: Lee A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Francis Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?