Standard Insurance Company, The v. Weiser
Plaintiff: The Standard Insurance Company and Standard Insurance Company, The
Defendant: Jason Weiser
Case Number: 2:2020cv02117
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT. The parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Order and Judgment (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/8/2020. (mam)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Judgment Consent by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Order and Judgment)(Pautler, Richard)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Hale Weirick on behalf of Jason Weiser (Weirick, Hale)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Standard Insurance Company, The upon Jason Weiser served on 3/15/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (smc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 **Please disregard - wrong event type used. See #7 for correct entry.** AFFIDAVIT of Ronald J. Rugen re Summons Issued by Standard Insurance Company, The. (Pautler, Richard) Modified on 4/9/2020 (smc).
March 12, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Weiser. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Standard Insurance Company identifying StanCorp Financial Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Pautler, Richard)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff The Standard Insurance Company. (Pautler, Richard)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5088374.), filed by The Standard Insurance Company.(Pautler, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurance Company, The v. Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard J. Pautler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Richard J. Pautler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Weiser
Represented By: Hale G. Weirick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?