Bowers v. Northern Ventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Miller and Northern Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02167
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement by Defendants Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Article written by E. Bowers, #2 Exhibit B: Copyright cases filed by E. Bowers, #3 Exhibit C: PACER listing of cases filed by Pltf's counsel)(Donnelly, Kyle)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement by Defendants Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. (Donnelly, Kyle)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/15/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/29/2020. (ts)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Eric Bowers re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED (Voytas, Richard)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc., filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) allows a party to amend his complaint once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier. On May 11, 2020, Defendants filed a joint motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b). Accordingly, Plaintiff is entitled to file his amended complaint as a matter of course and does not need leave of court to do so. Plaintiff shall electronically file his First Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringement within 21 days of May 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) as a Matter of Course by Plaintiff Eric Bowers(Voytas, Richard)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) as a Matter of Course by Plaintiff Eric Bowers (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, First Amended Complaint)(Voytas, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Defendants Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: ImageRights article, #2 Exhibit B: PACER listing of cases filed by Pltf, #3 Exhibit C: PACER listing of cases filed by Pltf's counsel)(Donnelly, Kyle)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Defendants Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. (Donnelly, Kyle)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/9/2020 for Defendants Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/24/2020. (ca)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Jeffrey R. Miller served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020 (Voytas, Richard)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Northern Ventures, Inc. served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020 (Voytas, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/01/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
March 31, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey R. Miller, Northern Ventures, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 31, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Voytas, Richard)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Voytas, Richard)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5104107.), filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Northern Ventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Miller
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?