RED Shield Administration, INC v. Acceleron Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RED Shield Administration, INC
Defendant: SUM Group, LLC, Uel Miller Shem, Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and Shem Uel Miller
Case Number: 2:2020cv02169
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Movants are hereby authorized to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and SUM Group, Inc. and Defendant/Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller in this case. All further service upon Acceleron Solutions, Inc. shall be sent to 1080 E Pecos Rd, Suite 21Chandler, Arizona 85225. All further service upon SUM Group, Inc. shall be sent to 1080 E Pecos Rd, Suite 21 Chandler, Arizona 85225. All further service upon Shem Uel Miller shall be sent to 905 W Roosevelt St. Phoenix, Arizona 85007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/22/2020. Mailed to pro se parties Acceleron Solutions, Inc.; SUM Group, Inc.; and Shem Uel Miller by regular mail. (ts)
December 21, 2020 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shem Miller)(Keppler, Isaac)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a) to Remaining Defendants. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its response to #52 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a) to Remaining Defendants is extended to one week following any ruling by the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Arizona denying the Motion for Stay Relief filed by Plaintiff in that court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 11, 2020 Filing 61 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #52 MOTION to Stay Case as to Defendants Acceleron and SUM Group by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC . (Parisi, Julie)
December 11, 2020 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #52 MOTION to Stay Case as to Defendants Acceleron and SUM Group by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Parisi, Julie)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Acceleron Solution, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff RED Shield. The deadline for Plaintiff to serve answers and objections to Acceleron Solution, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories is extended until four weeks after any denial of #52 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a) to Remaining Defendants, or four weeks after any lifting of the automatic stay referenced in the #51 Notice of Bankruptcy Regarding Shem Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 9, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant Acceleron Solutions, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Red Shield by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STAYING CASE IN PART. In light of the #51 Notice of Bankruptcy of Shem Miller, all proceedings related to Shem Miller in this matter are hereby stayed by operation of the automatic stay provision of the Bankruptcy Code. This stay applies only to Shem Miller. The parties shall advise the court of any action in the bankruptcy case which causes the automatic stay to be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 7, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of (Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of Defendant Shem Miller's Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Filing) by RED Shield Administration, INC (Hamilton, Brenda)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Regarding Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and SUM Group LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories. The D. Kan. Rule 37.1 deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and SUM Group LLC's responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and First Interrogatories is extended until two weeks after any denial of #52 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a) to Remaining Defendants, or two weeks after any lifting of the automatic stay referenced in the #51 Notice of Bankruptcy Regarding Shem Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
November 30, 2020 Filing 54 Second MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel Regarding Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and SUM Group, LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
November 27, 2020 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #52 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keppler, Isaac)
November 27, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keppler, Isaac)
November 27, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY by Isaac D. Keppler on behalf of Shem Uel Miller (Keppler, Isaac)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Regarding Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories. The D. Kan. Rule 37.1 deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to each Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and First Interrogatories is extended until November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
November 16, 2020 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time TO FILE MOTION TO COMPEL REGARDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
November 16, 2020 Filing 48 EXHIBIT B IN SUPPORT of #47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) and AMEND PLAINTIFFS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT MILLERS COUNTERCLAIM, AND TO ADD PARTY PLAINTIFF VERITAS GLOBAL PROTECTION SERVICES, INC. by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC Exhibit B - PLAINTIFFS AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT SHEM MILLERS COUNTERCLAIM. (Hamilton, Brenda)
November 16, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) and AMEND PLAINTIFFS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT MILLERS COUNTERCLAIM, AND TO ADD PARTY PLAINTIFF VERITAS GLOBAL PROTECTION SERVICES, INC. by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Hamilton, Brenda)
November 9, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories to Plaintiff RED Shield by Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller. (Martin, Bayli)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER finding as moot #35 Motion to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production. Counsel for Shem Uel Miller has informed the undersigned that the parties have resolved their dispute and no ruling on the merits is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Shem Miller's Motion to Compel Responses to His First Requests for Production. Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including November 2, 2020, in which to file its response to #35 Motion to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 26, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production (Second) by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
October 23, 2020 Filing 42 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held December 7, 2020 by RED Shield Administration, INC (Parisi, Julie)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Shem Miller's Motion to Compel Responses to His First Requests for Production. Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including October 26, 2020, in which to file its response to #35 Motion to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 19, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production (One-Week Extension) by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery to Defendants by Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC. (Martin, Bayli)
October 13, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE ENTRY from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held by telephone on 10/13/2020. Plaintiff/Counter Defendant appeared through counsel, Brenda G. Hamilton and Julie E. Parisi. Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc. and SUM Group, LLC, and Defendant/Counterclaimant Shem Uel Miller appeared through counsel, Isaac D. Keppler. The parties timely submitted reports in advance of the conference which familiarized the Court with the status of discovery. After discussing the issues with counsel, the Court granted Defendants and Defendant/Counterclaimant's unopposed oral motion for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents. Responses to this discovery are due no later than 12:00 PM on 10/16/2020. The parties informed the Court that they have agreed to mediate this case with mediator John Phillips. At the parties' request, the Court extended the mediation deadline to 12/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 12, 2020 Filing 37 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bayli Martin on behalf of All Defendants. (Martin, Bayli)
October 5, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production by Defendant Shem Uel Miller, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Keppler, Isaac)
October 5, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production by Defendant Shem Uel Miller, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keppler, Isaac)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Miller's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel Regarding Plaintiff's Responses to Miller's First Requests for Production. The D. Kan. Rule 37.1 deadline for Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Shem Miller to file a motion to compel related to Plaintiff's responses to Miller's First Requests for Production is extended until October 5, 2020. The Court discourages further requests to extend this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 21, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel related to Plaintiff's Responses to Millers First RFP by Defendant Shem Uel Miller, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keppler, Isaac)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Motions to Amend or Join Additional Parties. For good cause shown, the Scheduling Order deadline for the parties to file motions for leave to amend the pleadings or join additional parties is hereby extended to and including November 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting as unopposed #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests filed by all Defendants. The deadline for each Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents is extended to and including October 12, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 15, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for extension of time for Filing Motions to Amend or Join Additional Parties by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
September 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests by Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC, Counter Claimant Shem Uel Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keppler, Isaac)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. At the parties' request, the Status Conference, presently set for 9/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James, is hereby continued to 10/13/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone. Participants shall dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 Agreed ESI Protocol. (ts)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Report EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 10/23/2020 - ksd_james_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. Mediation deadline 11/6/2020. Discovery deadline 5/3/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/21/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James by telephone. Dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James by telephone. Dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Email status report to chambers by September 4, 2020 (no more than 3 pages) with issues to be addressed at the status conference - ksd_james_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. Dispositive motion deadline is 6/28/2021. The jury trial will be held before District Judge John W. Broomes in Kansas City, KS and is estimated to take 10 trial days. The trial will be set at the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/20/2020. (ck)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant Shem Miller's unopposed request for an extension of time to file a motion to compel. The D. Kan. Rule 37.1 deadline for Defendant Shem Miller to file a motion to compel related to Plaintiff's responses to Miller's First Requests for Production is extended until September 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered, as agreed to by the parties, limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/17/2020. (ts)
August 11, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of RED Shield's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendants Shem Miller, SUM Group and Acceleron Solutions, Inc. by RED Shield Administration, INC. (Hamilton, Brenda)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/31/2020. (ts)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 7/29/2020. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Red Shield's Responses and Objections to Defendant Miller's First Requests for Production of Documents by RED Shield Administration, INC (Hamilton, Brenda)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE by RED Shield Administration, INC of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Hamilton, Brenda)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Initial R.26 Disclosures by Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC. (Keppler, Isaac)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Make Their Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, Submit the Parties' Report of Their Rule 26(f) Conference, and Reschedule the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is re-set for July 29, 2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. The deadline for submission of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Conference and submission of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures is hereby extended to July 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/1/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Make Their Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures, Submit The Parties' Report of Their Rule 26(F) Conference, and Reschedule the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hamilton, Brenda)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Request for Production to Plaintiff by Shem Uel Miller. (Keppler, Isaac)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by RED Shield Administration, INC.(Hamilton, Brenda)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Counsel shall dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/16/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/26/2020. (ts)
May 25, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acceleron Solutions, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Keppler, Isaac)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC, Acceleron Solutions, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against RED Shield Administration, INC by Shem Uel Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keppler, Isaac) (Modified on 5/26/2020 to correct counter claimants. (heo))
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jean B. Menager on behalf of All Defendants (Menager, Jean)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendants. Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., SUM Group LLC, and Shem Uel Miller are hereby granted an extension of time, to and including May 22, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Acceleron Solutions, Inc., Shem Uel Miller, SUM Group, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keppler, Isaac)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Isaac D. Keppler on behalf of All Defendants. (Keppler, Isaac)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by RED Shield Administration, INC upon Shem Uel Miller served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by RED Shield Administration, INC upon SUM Group, LLC served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by RED Shield Administration, INC upon Acceleron Solutions, Inc. served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 1, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acceleron Solutions, Inc., SUM Group, LLC, Uel Miller Shem. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RED Shield Administration, INC identifying None as corporate parent . (Hamilton, Brenda)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff RED Shield Administration, INC. (Hamilton, Brenda)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5104427.), filed by RED Shield Administration, INC.(Hamilton, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RED Shield Administration, INC v. Acceleron Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUM Group, LLC
Represented By: Isaac D. Keppler
Represented By: Jean B. Menager
Represented By: Bayli Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uel Miller Shem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceleron Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac D. Keppler
Represented By: Jean B. Menager
Represented By: Bayli Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shem Uel Miller
Represented By: Isaac D. Keppler
Represented By: Jean B. Menager
Represented By: Bayli Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RED Shield Administration, INC
Represented By: Brenda G. Hamilton
Represented By: Julie E. Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?