Young v. G.B. et al
Plaintiff: David Paul Young
Defendant: G. B., Sharon Bridge and Chad Bridge
Case Number: 2:2020cv02179
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by David Paul Young upon Sharon Bridge served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020 (Brookreson, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/26/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/30/2020. (ts)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by G. B., Chad Bridge, Sharon Bridge.(Blickhan, James)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by David Paul Young upon G. B. served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020 (Brookreson, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by David Paul Young upon Chad Bridge served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020 (Brookreson, Steven)
April 6, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to G. B., Chad Bridge, Sharon Bridge. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff David Paul Young - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brookreson, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff David Paul Young. (Brookreson, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5108830.), filed by David Paul Young.(Brookreson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. G.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. B.
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Bridge
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Bridge
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paul Young
Represented By: Andrew B. Protzman
Represented By: Benjamin A. Stelter-Embry
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?