City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Defendant: MGP Ingredients, Inc., Thomas K. Pigott, Brandon M. Gall and Augustus C. Griffin
Case Number: 2:2020cv02180
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: From the date of consolidation, all future filings should be made in the lead case, 2:20-cv-2090-DDC-JPO. (smc)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL FOR JUDICIAL DISQUALIFICATION. The parties and their counsel are hereby informed of this potential for disqualification and ordered to comply with the directives set out in the contemporaneously issued Notice Concerning Potential Judicial Disqualification. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/28/2020. (smc) Modified title on 5/28/2020 (smc).
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Concerning Potential Judicial Disqualification - See Notice for details. (smc) Modified title on 5/28/2020 (smc).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust as Lead Plaintiff, APPROVING Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and CONSOLIDATING Related Actions re #4 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/28/20. (smc)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust (Meyer, Ryan)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. For the pending Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions (Doc. #4 ), the court sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants and any other interested party shall file any response by May 13, 2020. Movant shall file any reply by May 20, 2020. The court will determine from the briefing whether a factual dispute exists that will require an evidentiary hearing and coordinate with counsel about a hearing date, as appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
April 29, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by Plaintiff City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan K. Meyer, #2 Exhibit A: Certification, #3 Exhibit B: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit C: Notice of Pendency of Corbezzolo, #5 Exhibit D: Notice of Pendency of City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust, #6 Exhibit E: BLBG Resume)(Meyer, Ryan)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions by Plaintiff City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. (Meyer, Ryan)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. Brandon M. Gall waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Augustus C. Griffin waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; MGP Ingredients, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Thomas K. Pigott waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Meyer, Ryan)
April 6, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brandon M. Gall, Augustus C. Griffin, MGP Ingredients, Inc., Thomas K. Pigott. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. (Meyer, Ryan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5108833.), filed by City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust.(Meyer, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust v. MGP Ingredients, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Represented By: Ryan K. Meyer
Represented By: David G. Seely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGP Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas K. Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M. Gall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustus C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?