James v. Railcrew Xpress, LLC
Plaintiff: Carla James
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress and Railcrew Xpress, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02181
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/04/2020. (amh)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 8/25/2020. Discovery deadline 12/28/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2020. (ss)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2020. (T&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Railcrew Xpress. (Fay, Whitney)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures to Defendant by Carla James. (Davids, Brooke)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Railcrew Xpress. (Fay, Whitney)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/22/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/22/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/22/2020. (ss)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Railcrew Xpress.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Railcrew Xpress of Proof of Service under D. Kan. Rule 81.1(c)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Railcrew Xpress - trial to be held in Kansas City. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Railcrew Xpress. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 20CV00619 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5109022.), filed by Railcrew Xpress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Railcrew Xpress, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress
Represented By: Jeannie DeVeney
Represented By: Whitney Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie DeVeney
Represented By: Whitney L. Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla James
Represented By: Brooke Amos Davids
Represented By: Kevin A. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?