Bushnell Holdings, Inc. v. Outcome Driven Innovation et al
Plaintiff: Bushnell Holdings, Inc
Defendant: Outcome Driven Innovation and Richard Slevin
Case Number: 2:2020cv02220
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #11 Letter addressed to District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (smc)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Letter to Clerk, Johnson County District Court transmitting #10 Order. Mailed to Clerk, Johnson County District Court on 5/22/2020 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number 7018 0680 0001 8174 1493. (smc)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. It is hereby ORDERED that the above captioned case be remanded to the District Court of Johnson County, Kansas for further proceedings and that Defendants have until and including June 12, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/22/2020. (smc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court District Court of Johnson County, Kansas by Plaintiff Bushnell Holdings, Inc (Nash, Taryn)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants indicate that plaintiff opposes defendants' motion. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the relief requested, the court grants defendants the equivalent of a 14-day clerk's extension of time to answer pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 77.2(a)(2), which does not contemplate formal briefing on the requested extension. Defendants have up to and including May 21, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/11/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Reason attorney conflict with Matthew P. Clune. Doc. 4 - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition by Defendants Outcome Driven Innovation, Richard Slevin referred to Magistrate Judge Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/11/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ck)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Kennedy on behalf of Outcome Driven Innovation, Richard Slevin (Kennedy, Sharon)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition by Defendants Outcome Driven Innovation, Richard Slevin (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Clune, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by Outcome Driven Innovation, Richard Slevin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clune, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Outcome Driven Innovation, Richard Slevin. (Clune, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County Kansas, case number 20CV01304 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5130679.), filed by Richard Slevin, Outcome Driven Innovation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clune, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushnell Holdings, Inc. v. Outcome Driven Innovation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outcome Driven Innovation
Represented By: Matthew P. Clune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Slevin
Represented By: Matthew P. Clune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bushnell Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Taryn Nash
Represented By: Tedrick A. Housh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?