Stone et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Tom Stone and Beverly Stone
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02232
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Beverly Stone, Tom Stone re #14 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. 1 - UCCC with COMMENTS)(Huffman, Donna)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Dismiss NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC dba MR. COOPER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Response deadline is set for on or before 7/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 7/1/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
June 30, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC dba MR. COOPER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(adc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC dba MR. COOPER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Beverly Stone, Tom Stone (Huffman, Donna)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are expected to informally exchange information over the next 30 days. Status Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 using ACCESS CODE 9686294. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/17/20. (adc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 09:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. (adc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC dba MR. COOPER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D)(Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot the #5 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint as of right. Because the motion to dismiss is no longer directed to the operative complaint, the Court denies the motion as moot and without prejudice. Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Beverly Stone.(Huffman, Donna)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erin E. Edwards for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Erin E. Edwards to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5148068.) by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749, using ACCESS CODE 9686294. (adc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORDS - NOTICE of LODGING OF AND PROCEEDINGS by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cizmorris, Melissa) Modified title on 5/13/2020 (smc).
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES AND THE DISTRICT COURT OF BROWN COUNTY, KANSAS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Beverly Stone - trial to be held in Topeka. (Huffman, Donna)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit - Redacted D)(Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper identifying Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc. as corporate parent . (Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Cizmorris, Melissa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF BROWN COUNTY, KANSAS CIVIL COURT DEPARTMENT, case number 2020-cv-000012 PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5133920.), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cizmorris, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Stone
Represented By: Donna L. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Stone
Represented By: Donna L. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Louise Cizmorris
Represented By: Erin E. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?