Streit v. Home Point Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jason Streit
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corporation and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02237
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/20/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/30/2020. (ts)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Home Point Financial Corporation.(Othmer, Aaron)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Point Financial Corporation identifying Hope Point Capital, LP as corporate parent of Home Point Financial Corporation. (Othmer, Aaron)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including June 29, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #4 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant Home Point Financial Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant Home Point Financial Corporation is hereby granted an extension of time, to and including June 29, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #4 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint of Jason Streit by Defendant Home Point Financial Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Othmer, Aaron)
May 12, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Home Point Financial Corporation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Jason Streit against Equifax Information Services LLC, Home Point Financial Corporation, filed by Jason Streit.(Hernandez, Anthony)
May 8, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jason Streit - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hernandez, Anthony)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jason Streit. (Hernandez, Anthony)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5137492.), filed by Jason Streit.(Hernandez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streit v. Home Point Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Point Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Streit
Represented By: Anthony Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?