Scott v. Filta Group, Inc. The et al
Plaintiff: Shavar Scott
Defendant: The Filta Group, Inc., Drew Clark and Filta Group, Inc. The
Case Number: 2:2020cv02253
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #8 Order/Letter addressed to District Court of Wyandotte County. (hw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk, Wyandotte County District Court re: #7 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Mailed to Clerk, Wyandotte County District Court on 6/12/2020 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number# 70180680 0001 8174 1530. (ydm)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. It is Hereby Ordered that the case be remanded to the District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/12/2020. (ydm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Filta Group, Inc. The (Blickhan, James)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/6/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/6/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/27/2020. (ss)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Drew Clark, Filta Group, Inc. The - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Blickhan, James)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Drew Clark, The Filta Group, Inc..(Blickhan, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Drew Clark, The Filta Group, Inc.. (Blickhan, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County, case number 2020-CV-000258 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5146553.), filed by Drew Clark, The Filta Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blickhan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Filta Group, Inc. The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Filta Group, Inc.
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Clark
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filta Group, Inc. The
Represented By: James K. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavar Scott
Represented By: Robert D. Kingsland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?