Tucker et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Tucker and Mark Tucker
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. and Ethicon, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02277
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 58 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Haley Ann Stevenson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Stevenson, Haley)
June 9, 2020 Filing 57 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bryan E. Mouber on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Mouber, Bryan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 56 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
June 1, 2020 Filing 55 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-16593. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (smc)
May 25, 2020 Filing 54 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8791) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8909) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) - Pls' Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) - Defs Resp to Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8760) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8840) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2053) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2056) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2149) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2149) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2228) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2513) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2513) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2932) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3052) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8709) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Denise Elser, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8898) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Denise Elser)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 51 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2041) - Pls Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2043) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2136) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2234) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2927) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3051) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8759) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8853) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 50 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6886) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6890) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6979) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8741) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8834) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2831) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2943) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3025) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8772) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8863) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2083) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2086) - Defs' Memo in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2166) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2242) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 47 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8807) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8855) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 46 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8804) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8805) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8829) - Defs' Supp Exhibit to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8865) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1- Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8781) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8846) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2270) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls' Resp to Def's Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8775) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8861) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 42 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) - Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Pending in the cases on Exhibit A is Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Non-Retained Experts; the motions are GRANTED to the extent plaintiffs seek an order excluding expert witnesses designated by the Ethicon defendants in excess of five; Plaintiffs' Motions are otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/11/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (MDL 2327; cases on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #38 Response In Opposition. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 38 SUGGESTIONS by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker in opposition to #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 6, #2 Exhibit 7A, #3 Exhibit 7B, #4 Exhibit 7C, #5 Exhibit 7D, #6 Exhibits 8 - 14)(Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 37 OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #35 MOTION by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker to Strike Defendants' Non-Related Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker in Support of #35 MOTION by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker to Strike Defendants' Non-Related Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker to Strike Defendants' Non-Related Experts in Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in Support of #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - H)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 32 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Dr. Angela Shaw. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Angela Shaw on 10/11/19 at 9:00 a.m. CT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, LLC for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Tucker for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories. (Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Tucker for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production. (Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Brenda Tucker and Mark Tucker on 8/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Tucker, Mark Tucker for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production. (Gunn, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Mark Tucker. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (kab) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5686 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kab) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Smith on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Smith, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kimberly Dickerson Young on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Angela Shaw on 3/22/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Dismissing Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. with Prejudice) Pending in MDL 2327, is a Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. with Prejudice filed by plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibits A-G, and American Medical Systems, Inc., seeking dismissal of AMS from these actions with prejudice. Because all claims between them have been compromised and settled, including all claims, counterclaims, cross-claims and third party claims, the Joint Motion to Dismiss AMS with Prejudice is GRANTED. Other defendants remain in these actions, and plaintiffs will continue to prosecute these actions against them. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/18/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibits A-G) (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Tracy G. Weiss on 8/12/13. American Medical Systems, Inc. waiver mailed on 7/3/2013, answer due 9/3/2013. (Weiss, Tracy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
August 3, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
July 3, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 53 (AGREED ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS) entered on 06/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]
June 30, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2510032. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Tracy G. Weiss
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Laura H. Smith
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Haley Ann Stevenson
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Laura H. Smith
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Haley Ann Stevenson
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Laura H. Smith
Represented By: Haley Ann Stevenson
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Tucker
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Represented By: Amy Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tucker
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Represented By: Amy Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?