Employers Insurance Company of Wausau v. Enerdel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Black & Veatch Corporation, Employer Insurance Company of Wausau and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Enerdel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02290
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Enerdel, Inc..(Morris, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 11/6/2020. Mediation deadline 12/4/2020. Discovery deadline 7/22/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 using ACCESS CODE 9686294. Dispositive motion deadline 9/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Estimated trial time 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/31/20. (adc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Enerdel, Inc. filed by Employer Insurance Company of Wausau. (Refiling of docket entry 16 for Administrative Purposes Only.) (ydm)
July 27, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #16 Amended Document: The text has been modified. Incorrect event code used. Document is an Amended Complaint instead of Amended Document. (ydm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DOC #19 FOR CORRECTION***FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Insurance Company of Wausau. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kennedy, Court) Modified on 7/27/2020 to edit docket entry text. Incorrect event code used (ydm). Modified on 8/3/2020 (ydm).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ESTABLISHING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION PROTOCOL. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/23/20. (adc)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/23/20. (adc)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend to Rename Plaintiff. Finding good cause, and noting the motion is unopposed, Plaintiff's motion to amend the pleading is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file its Amended Complaint no later than 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/23/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #11 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(Kennedy, Court)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Court)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica M. Skarin for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/22/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Jessica M. Skarin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5200148.) by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Kennedy, Court)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James C. Morris on behalf of Enerdel, Inc.. (Morris, James)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 7/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/24/2020. (ala)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Shapiro, Tony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Enerdel, Inc.. (Shapiro, Tony)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enerdel, Inc. identifying Enerl, Inc. as corporate parent (Shapiro, Tony)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Enerdel, Inc..(Shapiro, Tony)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Enerdel, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Shapiro, Tony)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Johsnon County, Kansas, case number 20CV01570 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5164421.), filed by Enerdel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Filing Notice to State Court, #3 Proof of Service on Plaintiff of Removal)(Shapiro, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau v. Enerdel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enerdel, Inc.
Represented By: Tony Shapiro
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee of Black & Veatch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employer Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Jessica M. Skarin
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica M. Skarin
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?