Eaton v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Eaton
Defendant: Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Ryan Leiker, The Ensign Group, Inc., Little Blue Health Holdings, LLC, Ensign Facility Services, Inc. and Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02291
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Brian Eaton re #28 Motion for Leave. (Stahle, Rachel)
July 10, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #29 MOTION for Hearing re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #28 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(md)
July 9, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Hearing re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #28 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Request for Oral Argument by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker (Christopher, Barbara)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Surreply, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1)(Christopher, Barbara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Brian Eaton re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 3 - 9)(Stahle, Rachel) (Modified on 7/8/2020 to correct title; incorrect ecf event used. (heo))
July 1, 2020 Filing 26 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Wyandotte County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records eaton - notice of filing and exhibit 1 state_4073363, #2 State Court Records JUDGESENTRY, #3 State Court Records petition for damages_4054377, #4 State Court Records pro hac vice motion_4055125, #5 State Court Records pro hac vice proposed order_4055134, #6 State Court Records pro hac vice verified app_4055127)(Christopher, Barbara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #24 Response to Motion by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker . (Christopher, Barbara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker re #17 Motion to Remand to State Court (Christopher, Barbara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 (DISREGARD FILING- See correct filing at DE 24) RESPONSE by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker re #17 Motion to Remand to State Court (Christopher, Barbara) Modified on 6/23/2020 (smc).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Unopposed #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #5 is due 21 days following the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion for remand #17 . Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 6/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
June 22, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(md)
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support by Plaintiff Brian Eaton (Stahle, Rachel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: The undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge, James P. O'Hara, hereby stays the case until Judge Teeter rules on the pending dispositive motions. The June 29, 2020 scheduling conference is canceled. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/19/20. (jc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Joint Report Regarding Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference by Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker (Christopher, Barbara)
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Brian Eaton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Stahle, Rachel)
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Brian Eaton (Stahle, Rachel)
June 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Givens on behalf of Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker. (Givens, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Ensign Facility Services, Inc., Little Blue Health Holdings, LLC, The Ensign Group, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Larsen, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ensign Facility Services, Inc. identifying The Ensign Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Larsen, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Klose on behalf of Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker. (Klose, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Ensign Group, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Larsen, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Acosta on behalf of Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker. (Acosta, Richard)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Little Blue Health Holdings, LLC identifying The Ensign Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Larsen, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker of Notice of Removal to the District Court of Kansas (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mathew L. Larsen on behalf of Ensign Facility Services, Inc., Little Blue Health Holdings, LLC, The Ensign Group, Inc. (Larsen, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Barbara K. Christopher on behalf of Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker. (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc. identifying The Ensign Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation identifying The Ensign Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Ryan Leiker. (Christopher, Barbara)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County, case number 2020-CV-000293 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5165810.), filed by Ryan Leiker, Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc., Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christopher, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Big Blue Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., d/b/a Riverbend Post-Acute Rehabilitation
Represented By: Matthew Klose
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Represented By: Robert J. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Leiker
Represented By: Matthew Klose
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Represented By: Robert J. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ensign Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew L. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Blue Health Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mathew L. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign Facility Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew L. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Klose
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Represented By: Robert J. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?