Quilted Memories, LLC v. FedEx Ground Package System Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Quilted Memories, L.L.C.
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02293
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel telephonically informed the court that the firm's computer system is down and that opposing counsel has no objection to the delay caused by this. Duly informed, the court awaits a motion and response from the plaintiff upon the timely restoration of computer services to the plaintiff's firm. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ctv)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Response deadline 8/7/2020. Entered by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
July 21, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
July 21, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Quilted Memories, L.L.C. (Harrah, Desarae)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss; Response deadline 7/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/8/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
July 7, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Quilted Memories, L.L.C. (Harrah, Desarae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument by FedEx Ground Package System Inc. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Low, Spencer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Low, Spencer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (Low, Spencer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by FedEx Ground Package System Inc. of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Low, Spencer)
June 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Fogleman, Alan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedEx Ground Package System Inc. identifying FedEx Corporation as corporate parent . (Fogleman, Alan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System Inc.. (Fogleman, Alan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, KS, case number 20CV02040 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5166920.), filed by FedEx Ground Package System Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court filings, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's KS SOS summary)(Fogleman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quilted Memories, LLC v. FedEx Ground Package System Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quilted Memories, L.L.C.
Represented By: Desarae Gayle Harrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc.
Represented By: Alan Thomas Fogleman
Represented By: Spencer Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?