Lawrence Goings v. Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Goings
Defendant: James A. Pressley, Michael Morash, John J. Skermont, Mike Hidas, Robert Hutsell, Ronnie L. Traxler, Jeff Brown, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Larry Jansen, J. Tom Baca, Lawrence J. McManamon, Warren Fairley, Eric A. Heuser, Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Scott Anderson, David J. Zach, Mark Vandiver, Charles L. Hancock, Robert Lundsford, Jr., D. David Haggerty, Jr. and Terry AnCel
Case Number: 2:2020cv02294
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per EFM Chambers re #29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sz)
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Lawrence Goings with Prejudice (Siro, Rik)
July 8, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, filed by Lawrence Goings.(Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon David J. Zach served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Mark Vandiver served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Ronnie L. Traxler served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon John J. Skermont served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon James A. Pressley served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Michael Morash served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Larry Jansen served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Lawrence J. McManamon served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Robert Lunsford, Jr served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Mike Hidas served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Eric A. Heuser served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Robert Hutsell served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Charles Hancock served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon D. David Haggerty, Jr. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Warren Fairley served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Scott Anderson served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Jeff Brown served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon J. Tom Baca served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Terry AnCel served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lawrence Goings upon Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Siro, Rik)
June 16, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Terry AnCel, Scott Anderson, J. Tom Baca, Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Jeff Brown, Warren Fairley, D. David Haggerty, Jr., Charles Hancock, Eric A. Heuser, Mike Hidas, Robert Hutsell, Larry Jansen, Robert Lunsford, Jr, Lawrence J. McManamon, Michael Morash, James A. Pressley, John J. Skermont, Ronnie L. Traxler, Mark Vandiver, David J. Zach. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Kroll, #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael M. Licata, and #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan J. Martin as counsel for Lawrence Goings pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/15/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Susan Martin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5167503.) by Plaintiff Lawrence Goings (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Siro, Rik)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Michael M. Licata to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5167499.) by Plaintiff Lawrence Goings (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Siro, Rik)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Jennifer Kroll to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5167430.) by Plaintiff Lawrence Goings (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Siro, Rik)
June 12, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lawrence Goings. (Siro, Rik)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5167115.), filed by Lawrence Goings.(Siro, Rik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence Goings v. Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Morash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Skermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hidas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hutsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie L. Traxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tom Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. McManamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Heuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Zach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lundsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. David Haggerty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry AnCel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Goings
Represented By: Eric W. Smith
Represented By: Rik N. Siro
Represented By: Athena M. Dickson
Represented By: Ryan P. McEnaney
Represented By: Raymond Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?