Lunn v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Lunn
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv02311
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically opened in the Southern District of Indiana (20-6192). (hw)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-96). Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Indiana (MDL 2570). ***Terminating Case. (hw)
August 12, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern Indiana.(hw)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Leonard Lunn upon Cook Medical, LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Franciskato, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Leonard Lunn upon Cook Medical Incorporated served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Franciskato, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Leonard Lunn upon Cook Incorporated served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Franciskato, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Leonard Lunn upon Cook Group Incorporated served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020 (Franciskato, Brian)
June 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Leonard Lunn - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Franciskato, Brian)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Leonard Lunn. (Franciskato, Brian)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5179075.), filed by Leonard Lunn.(Franciskato, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lunn v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Lunn
Represented By: Brian S. Franciskato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?