Boyd v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Herman Boyd
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02329
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Requests for Production and First Interrogatories upon Defendant by Herman Boyd (Saxton, Don)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America re: #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Moothart, Bruce)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Report EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 9/14/2020. Mediation deadline 3/29/2021. Discovery deadline 4/9/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 - ACCESS CODE 4901386. Dispositive motion deadline 6/1/2021. Jury trial is estimated to take 5 days and is set for 2/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/17/2020. (ck)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 8/13/2020. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Haddad, Mark)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Herman Boyd re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Document originally filed as DE #14 using the wrong event; this entry was made for administrative purposes.)(smc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 (PLEASE DISREGARD - See #15 for correct filing) REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Herman Boyd re: #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Saxton, Don) Modified on 8/7/2020, wrong event used (smc).
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Moothart, Bruce)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count IV by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moothart, Bruce)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot Safeco Insurance Company of America's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. #5 ). Defendant's motion seeks dismissal of plaintiff's original Petition for Damages (Doc. 1-1), originally filed in the Wyandotte County District Court. Plaintiff since has filed a First Amended Complaint as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) (Doc. 10). The First Amended Complaint rendered defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5) the original Petition moot. The court thus denies defendant's Motion to Dismiss as moot but without prejudice to any renewed motion directed at plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Herman Boyd.(Saxton, Don)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) allows a party to amend his complaint once as a matter of course within (A) 21 days after service of a responsive pleading, or (B) if the pleading is one to which a responsive pleading is required, 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier. On July 1, 2020, Defendant filed a responsive pleading (ECF No. 6) and a Rule 12(b) motion (ECF No. 5). Accordingly, until July 22, 2020 Plaintiff is entitled to file his amended complaint as a matter of course and does not need leave of court to do so. Because this matter was removed from state court, the document will be a complaint and not a petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint , MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response deadline 7/28/2020) by Plaintiff Herman Boyd (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Saxton, Don)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/23/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 8/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/1/2020. (ts)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Moothart, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support (Count II and IV) by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moothart, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 30, 2020 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Safeco Insurance Company of America on 6/1/2020 (ORIGINALLY FILED IN WYANDOTTE COUNTY DISTRICT) (ca)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark M. Haddad on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Haddad, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Safeco Corporation as corporate parent . (Moothart, Bruce)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Moothart, Bruce)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-000206 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5184619.), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moothart, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Mark M. Haddad
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Boyd
Represented By: Don P. Saxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?