Hatcher v. HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lane Hatcher
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc., HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC and HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC doing business as Brighton Gardens of Prairie Village
Case Number: 2:2020cv02374
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Lane Hatcher upon Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Lane Hatcher upon HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
September 8, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC and Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lane Hatcher. (Steele, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Lane Hatcher - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5215165.), filed by Lane Hatcher.(Steele, Jonathan)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatcher v. HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCP Prairie Village KS OPCO LLC doing business as Brighton Gardens of Prairie Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Hatcher
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?