Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. v. Intervet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.
Defendant: Kansas State University Research Foundation, Intervet Inc. d/b/a Merck Animal Health and Intervet, Inc. doing business as Merck Animal Health
Case Number: 2:2020cv02378
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Intervet, Inc. identifying Merck & Co., Inc. as corporate parent . (Gilman, Stacey)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE In light of the #24 Notice of Pendency of Post-Grant Proceeding, all proceedings in this civil action are hereby stayed by operation of 35 U.S.C. 325(a)(2). The stay shall extend until one of the conditions specified in 35 U.S.C. 325(a)(2) is met or until further order. Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. shall inform the Court when the related PGR proceeding (PGR2020-00076) is completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed NOTICE of Unopposed Notice of Applicability of Automatic Statutory Stay by Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (Gilman, Stacey)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Pendency of Post Grant Proceeding by Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (Gilman, Stacey)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michelle L. Ernst; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Tinsley Whitt; granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arlene Lee Chow; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam L. Perlman; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ernest Yakob for Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Ernest Yakob to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5271012.) by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Adam L. Perlman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5271009.) by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Arlene Lee Chow to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5270995.) by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Jacob Tinsley Whitt to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5270965.) by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Michelle L. Ernst to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5270958.) by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants Intervet Inc. d/b/a Merck Animal Health and Kansas State University Research Foundation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Intervet Inc. d/b/a Merck Animal Health and Kansas State University Research Foundation are granted an extension of time, to and including October 9, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendants Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Gilman, Stacey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation. (Gilman, Stacey)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 Inervet, Inc., d/b/a Merck Animal Health, et al SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. upon Intervet, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020 (Blegen, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Kansas State University Research Foundation SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. upon Kansas State University Research Foundation served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020 (Blegen, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Seeger for Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max E. Rubinson for Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew W. Howell for Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Judy Jarecki-Black for Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Richard Seeger to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5231922.) by Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A, #2 ECF Registration Form Ex B)(Blegen, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Max E. Rubinson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5231915.) by Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A, #2 ECF Registration Form Ex B)(Blegen, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Matthew Howell to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5231855.) by Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A, #2 ECF Registration Form Ex B)(Blegen, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Dr. Judy Jarecki-Black, Esq to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5231575.) by Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Ex. A, #2 Affidavit Ex B)(Blegen, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. identifying Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health International GmbH as corporate parent (Blegen, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Blegen, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Intervet, Inc., Kansas State University Research Foundation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.. (Blegen, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5217390.), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Petition for Post Grant review)(Blegen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. v. Intervet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Blegen
Represented By: Max E. Rubinson
Represented By: Richard A. Seeger
Represented By: Matthew W. Howell
Represented By: Judy Jarecki-Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas State University Research Foundation
Represented By: Michelle L. Ernst
Represented By: Adam L. Perlman
Represented By: Arlene Lee Chow
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Ernest Yakob
Represented By: Jacob Tinsley Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intervet Inc. d/b/a Merck Animal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intervet, Inc. doing business as Merck Animal Health
Represented By: Michelle L. Ernst
Represented By: Adam L. Perlman
Represented By: Arlene Lee Chow
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Ernest Yakob
Represented By: Jacob Tinsley Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?