Mahmood v. Holman Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adam M. Mahmood
Defendant: Holman Transportation Services, Inc. and Gregory D. Carney
Case Number: 2:2020cv02387
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 10/16/2020. Status Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All participants must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/1/2020. (ss)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/1/2020. (AT&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Gregory D. Carney, Holman Transportation Services, Inc.. (Ketchum, Amanda)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Adam M. Mahmood. (White, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties' informal request to extend the deadline to submit the planning report and disclosures is granted. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline is now 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holman Transportation Services, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Saghir, Anne)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/23/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/23/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/19/2020. (ss)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Judy on behalf of Gregory D. Carney, Holman Transportation Services, Inc.. (Judy, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Gregory D. Carney.(Ketchum, Amanda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Holman Transportation Services, Inc..(Ketchum, Amanda)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Holman Transportation Services, Inc. on 7/20/2020 (ORIGINALLY FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 7/30/2020 SEE DE #1 ) (ca)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Gregory D. Carney on 7/27/2020 (ORIGINALLY FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 7/30/2020; SEE DE #1 ) (ca) Modified on 8/10/2020 (ca).
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Gregory D Carney, Holman Transportation Services, Inc.. (Ketchum, Amanda)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anne Lindner Saghir on behalf of Gregory D Carney, Holman Transportation Services, Inc.. (Saghir, Anne)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 20CV02932 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5223166.), filed by Gregory D Carney, Holman Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings)(Ketchum, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahmood v. Holman Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam M. Mahmood
Represented By: Michael B. White, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Lindner Saghir
Represented By: Amanda Pennington Ketchum
Represented By: Michael J. Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Carney
Represented By: Anne Lindner Saghir
Represented By: Amanda Pennington Ketchum
Represented By: Michael J. Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?