United States of America v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc. and Kaz USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02409
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Steven W. Brookreson on behalf of United States of America. (Brookreson, Steven)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/9/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/13/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kaz USA, Inc. identifying Helen of Troy Limited as corporate parent . (Patterson, John)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaz USA, Inc..(Patterson, John)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rodney L. Cook for Honeywell International, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Rodney L. Cook to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5270288.) by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Patterson, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Kaz USA, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt)(Lynn, Wendy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by United States of America upon Honeywell International, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt)(Lynn, Wendy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Patterson, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International, Inc..(Patterson, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John E. Patterson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Patterson, John)
August 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Honeywell International, Inc., Kaz USA, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lynn, Wendy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by United States of America.(Lynn, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney L. Cook
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: James T. Seigfreid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaz USA, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: James T. Seigfreid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: K. Tyson Shaw
Represented By: Wendy A. Lynn
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?