Greek House Chefs, Inc. v. Fine Thyme Food LLC
Plaintiff: Greek House Chefs, Inc.
Defendant: Fine Thyme Food LLC doing business as Best Fed Greeks
Case Number: 2:2020cv02472
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby required, on or before December 16, 2020, to either move for entry of default and file a motion for default judgment as to Defendant Fine Thyme Food LLC, d/b/a Best Fed Greeks, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 and D. Kan. Rule 77.2(a)(6), or show good cause in writing to the Honorable John W. Broomes, United States District Judge, why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/16/2020.(ct)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Greek House Chefs, Inc. upon Fine Thyme Food LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 11/3/2020 - answer due on 10/27/2020 (correcting erroneous entry by plaintiff's counsel when filing Doc. #8) (Heinemann, David)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SEE DE 9 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Greek House Chefs, Inc. upon Fine Thyme Food LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020 (Heinemann, David) Modified on 10/16/2020 (ca).
October 1, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fine Thyme Food LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan L. Kennedy for Greek House Chefs, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Jonathan L. Kennedy to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5272228.) by Plaintiff Greek House Chefs, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. 1 - Affidavit of Jonathan L. Kennedy, #2 ECF Registration Form Ex. 2 - Attorney electronic filing registration form)(Heinemann, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Heinemann, David)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - AO 120 form is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greek House Chefs, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Heinemann, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Greek House Chefs, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Heinemann, David)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Greek House Chefs, Inc.. (Heinemann, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5269221.), filed by Greek House Chefs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Trademark Registration No. 5,981,062, #2 Ex. B - Trademark Registration No. 5,755,925, #3 Ex. C - Trademark Registration No. 4,247,656, #4 Ex. D - March 11, 2020 letter to Best Fed Greeks, #5 Ex. E - March 23, 2020 letter from Best Fed Greeks' counsel)(Heinemann, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greek House Chefs, Inc. v. Fine Thyme Food LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greek House Chefs, Inc.
Represented By: David Lee Heinemann
Represented By: Jonathan L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Thyme Food LLC doing business as Best Fed Greeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?