Matheny et al v. LMH Health et al
Plaintiff: Valentina Matheny and Clayton Matheny
Defendant: LMH Health, Emily Fox, Pamela Pray, Lawrence Memorial Hospital and Leslie Underwood
Case Number: 2:2020cv02491
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
2 Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE by LMH Health, Leslie Underwood of Rule 26 Disclosures (Wray, Trevin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Emily Fox of Defendant Emily Fox, C.N.M.'s Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Brown, Jeff)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Clayton Matheny, Valentina Matheny of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Cullan, Samuel)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Pamela Pray of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Waters, Diane)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/3/2020. (ala)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Emily Fox - trial to be held in Topeka. (Brown, Jeff)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Emily Fox.(Brown, Jeff)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeff K. Brown on behalf of Emily Fox. (Brown, Jeff)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Leslie Underwood.(Wray, Trevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by LMH Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended & Restated Bylaws of LMH)(Wray, Trevin)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Reassigned due to attorney conflict. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(tvn)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Pamela Pray (Waters, Diane)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela Pray. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Waters, Diane)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Valentina Matheny, Clayton Matheny upon Pamela Pray served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020 (Cullan, Samuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Valentina Matheny, Clayton Matheny upon Leslie Underwood served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Cullan, Samuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Valentina Matheny, Clayton Matheny upon LMH Health served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Cullan, Samuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Valentina Matheny, Clayton Matheny upon Emily Fox served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Cullan, Samuel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs L.D.M., Clayton Matheny, Valentina Matheny - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cullan, Samuel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs L.D.M., Clayton Matheny, Valentina Matheny. (Cullan, Samuel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5277688.), filed by Valentina Matheny, L.D.M., Clayton Matheny.(Cullan, Samuel) Modified on 10/5/2020 to block initiating document from public view due to violation of privacy policy (ca). #1 Redacted Complaint #2 Redacted Exhibit 1 #3 Redacted Exhibit 2 #4 Redacted Exhibit 3 #5 Redacted Exhibit 4 #6 Redacted Exhibit 5, #7 Redacted Exhibit 6, #8 Redacted Exhibit 7, #9 Redacted Exhibit 8, #10 Redacted Exhibit 9) (ca).
October 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emily Fox, LMH Health, Pamela Pray, Leslie Underwood. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matheny et al v. LMH Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMH Health
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Fox
Represented By: Jeff K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Pray
Represented By: Diane L. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Underwood
Represented By: Trevin E. Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Matheny
Represented By: Samuel K. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Matheny
Represented By: Samuel K. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?