Haught et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW J HAUGHT, CHEALSEY HAUGHT and Andrew J. Haught
Defendant: MENARD, INC, WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION and Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02521
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time four days. Discovery deadline 7/16/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 8/27/2021. Mediation deadline 4/30/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 2/26/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/10/20. (aw)
December 10, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kyle W. LeClere for Menard, Inc. and Whirlpool Corporation pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Kyle W. LeClere to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5308224.) by Defendants Menard, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Johannsen, Derek)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/17/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/1/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/30/2020. (ht)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation.(Johannsen, Derek)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Menard, Inc..(Johannsen, Derek)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION identifying none as corporate parent . (Johannsen, Derek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MENARD, INC identifying Menard as corporate parent . (Johannsen, Derek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of All Defendants. (Johannsen, Derek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants MENARD, INC, WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. (Johannsen, Derek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial District Court of Bourbon County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-000070 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5296280.), filed by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Johannsen, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haught et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENARD, INC
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: Kyle W. LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: Kyle W. LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW J HAUGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEALSEY HAUGHT
Represented By: Kaylie E. Schmutz
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Haught
Represented By: Kaylie E. Schmutz
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?