McDonough v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JEFF MCDONOUGH
Defendant: BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC., BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. Operator doing business as Brookdale Leawood State Line and Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02544
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. PARTICIPANTS MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 1/12/2021. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 1/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/18/2020. (ct)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Acosta, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Barbara K. Christopher on behalf of Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. (Christopher, Barbara)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Acosta on behalf of Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.. (Acosta, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Acosta, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc..(Acosta, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Acosta, Richard)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Brookdale Senior Living, Inc..(Acosta, Richard)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/21/2020 for Defendant Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/2/2020. (ca)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/17/2020 for Defendant Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/2/2020. (ca)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jeff McDonough upon Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jeff McDonough upon Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020 (Steele, Jonathan)
November 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff JEFF MCDONOUGH - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff JEFF MCDONOUGH. (Steele, Jonathan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-5307274.), filed by JEFF MCDONOUGH.(Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonough v. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF MCDONOUGH
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. Operator doing business as Brookdale Leawood State Line
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Acosta
Represented By: Barbara K. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?