Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Biggs et al
Plaintiff: Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance and Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Laura Piper, Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC and Kansas Insurance Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02558
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendants Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper re #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Cox, Vincent)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Vincent M. Cox on behalf of All Defendants. (Cox, Vincent)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response deadline is on or before 12/29/2020. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
December 15, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Biggs, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper - trial to be held in Topeka. (Biggs, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 20 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper. (Biggs, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper.(Biggs, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Defendants Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper (Biggs, James)
December 15, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(md)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Life Insurance, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Wolf, Gregory)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Life Insurance, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company (Wolf, Gregory)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance upon Kansas Insurance Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Wolf, Gregory)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance upon Laura Piper served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Wolf, Gregory)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance upon JM Biggs, LLC served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Wolf, Gregory)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance upon Jeff Biggs served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Wolf, Gregory)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Serving the Spouse of Defendant Michelle Berry, Mike Berry, by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance upon Michelle Berry served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/15/2020 (Wolf, Gregory)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. On November 9, 2020, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction #4 . Plaintiffs have responded and adequately identified the citizenship of all parties, which are diverse under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Based on the information provided, the Court finds that Plaintiffs have satisfied their burden to show why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - JM Biggs Articles of Organization)(Wolf, Gregory)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/15/2020 for Defendants JM Biggs, LLC, Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/20/2020. (ca)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James B. Biggs on behalf of All Defendants (Biggs, James)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Paul Matthew Flucke on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Flucke, Paul)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farm Bureau Life Insurance, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company identifying FBL Financial Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Wolf, Gregory)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 11/23/2020. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/9/2020. (ctv)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Life Insurance, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Petitioner Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wolf, Gregory)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Farm Bureau Life Insurance, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Petitioner Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Wolf, Gregory)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5314708.), filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Western Agriculture Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Wolf, Gregory)
November 6, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelle Berry, Jeff Biggs, JM Biggs, LLC, Kansas Insurance Inc., Laura Piper. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al v. Biggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Piper
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: James B. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Berry
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: James B. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Biggs
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: James B. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Biggs, LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: James B. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Insurance Inc.
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: James B. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Agriculture Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory T. Wolf
Represented By: Paul Matthew Flucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Life Insurance
Represented By: Gregory T. Wolf
Represented By: Paul Matthew Flucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory T. Wolf
Represented By: Paul Matthew Flucke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?