Access Investment, LLC v. Tarpenning
Plaintiff: Access Investment, LLC
Defendant: Sean K. Tarpenning
Case Number: 2:2020cv02597
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER to the Johnson County Courthouse in Olathe regarding the remand of case number 20-CV-04530 (certified tracking #7018 0680 0001 8173 7694) (ca)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/11/2020. (ca)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Remand to State Court and RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, to Remand to State Court by Sean K. Tarpenning. (Tompkins, Benjamin) Modified on 12/8/2020 to change title, incorrect event used (hw).
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/16/2020 for Defendant Sean K. Tarpenning to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/1/2020. (ca)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By December 9, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report, with affidavits attached, demonstrating full citizenship of each of the parties and showing cause why this case should not be remanded to the state court for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/25/20. (jc)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/25/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/25/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Sean Tarpenning - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Sean Tarpenning. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 20-cv-04530 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5333154.), filed by Sean Tarpenning. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Exs. A (Petition) and B (Summons))(Tompkins, Benjamin)
November 25, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Access Investment, LLC v. Tarpenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Investment, LLC
Represented By: Stewart C. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean K. Tarpenning
Represented By: Benjamin L. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?