PKG Contracting, Inc. v. MNX, Inc.
Plaintiff: PKG Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Smith & Loveless Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MNX, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02646
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time four to five days. Discovery deadline 8/30/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 10/1/2021. Mediation deadline 6/30/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 5/7/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/17/21. (aw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 91 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
February 5, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING Status/Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. Counsel should confer and submit a joint proposal of amendments to the schedule by noon on 2/16/2021, sent to KSD_Gale_Chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are advised to refer to the Scheduling Order form found on the Court's internet website under Civil Forms. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
February 5, 2021 Filing 89 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/5/2021. (Court Reporter Dani Murray.) (bw)
January 29, 2021 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Production of Documents to Smith & Loveless, Inc. by PKG Contracting, Inc. (Hansen, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING TELEPHONE Status Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 10:00 AM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, ACCESS CODE 4697748 before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
January 8, 2021 Filing 86 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kenton E. Snow on behalf of MNX, Inc. (Snow, Kenton)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gordon H. Hansmeier for PKG Contracting, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/6/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
January 5, 2021 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT of Gordon H. Hansmeier re #83 MOTION for attorney Gordon H. Hansmeier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5373268.) by Plaintiff PKG Contracting, Inc.(Hansen, John)
January 5, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for attorney Gordon H. Hansmeier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5373268.) by Plaintiff PKG Contracting, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Hansen, John)
January 5, 2021 Filing 82 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John G. Hansen on behalf of PKG Contracting, Inc. (Hansen, John)
December 21, 2020 Filing 81 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (heo)
December 21, 2020 Filing 80 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-00742. Electronic case file and docket sheet received. (heo)
December 15, 2020 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/13/2020 before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (23 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 12/22/2020. Redaction Request due 1/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (EDD) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
December 15, 2020 ***Staff notes - Transcript fee paid by Kurt M Mitchell. Electronic access to transcript #79 granted during the 90-day restriction period. (EDD) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TRANSFER/CHANGE VENUE, AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Smith & Loveless, Inc.'s, Motion to Transfer/Change Venue #54 is GRANTED. Smith & Loveless, Inc.'s, Amended Motion to Dismiss/General #52 is DENIED AS MOOT. MNX, Inc.'s, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #67 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/14/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #76 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2020 re #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc., #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc., #52 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc. The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
November 13, 2020 *** Motions Taken Under Advisement: #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue , #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #52 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 75 Reply to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scott, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 74 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by PKG Contracting, Inc..(Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Mike Sikorski in OPPOSITION TO #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 71 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc..(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 70 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc..(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 66 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by MNX, Inc. re #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by MNX, Inc..(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MNX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #50 Letter to District Judge. Defendant/Third-Party MNX's request to file and serve a motion for summary judgment prior to the close of discovery is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/15/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 62 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by PKG Contracting, Inc. . (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 60 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc..(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 59 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #54 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc..(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 58 Second Declaration of Lanette Wickham in Support of #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc..(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 57 Second Declaration of Timothy Carrigan in Support of #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 ***Motions terminated: #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Support re #52 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate LR7)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 52 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 51 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 50 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by MNX, Inc. . (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 49 MNX, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff, CROSSCLAIM against Smith & Loveless, Inc.. filed by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER on #46 Stipulation. Smith & Loveless, Inc. response due 9/11/2020; Smith & Loveless, Inc. answer due 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/4/2020.(TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #46 Stipulation. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline for Responsive Pleading by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. Jointly Signed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 45 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing is rescheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. The parties shall receive an e-mail invite to this Zoom Hearing. ***For remote access call 1-669-254-5252 Access Code 161-527-4114 Security Code 683463393(KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 44 MNX, Inc.'a ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff filed by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 43 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE OF #42 . DECLARATION of Mark Enoch in Opposition to #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by MNX, Inc., MNX, Inc. (Mitchell, Kurt) Modified text on 8/27/2020 (lmb). [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Mark Enoch in Opposition to #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by MNX, Inc., MNX, Inc..(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Kurt Mitchell in Opposition to #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by MNX, Inc., MNX, Inc..(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by MNX, Inc., MNX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dan Crane Sanders for Smith & Loveless, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/21/2020. (NAH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 *** Attorney Elizabeth Ridley Scott for MNX, Inc.,Elizabeth Ridley Scott for MNX, Inc. added. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 ***Party Smith & Loveless, Inc. added as Defendant. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M Mitchell on behalf of MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MNX, Inc., Smith & Loveless, Inc.. filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. No summons requested. (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dan C. Sanders. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7966863 filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #27 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc..(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Dan C. Sanders as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1-669-254-5252. Use access code 161-527-4114 and security code 683463393. Zoom Hearing Invitation information has been sent to counsel in this case. (KMW) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Timothy J. Carrigan in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Lanette Wickham in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #27 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for ThirdParty Defendant Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Carrigan, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake W Duerre on behalf of Smith & Loveless, Inc.. (Duerre, Blake) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MNX, Inc.. Smith & Loveless, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Return of Service Executed for Summons & Third Party Complaint, Exhibits A and B served on Lanette Wichkam on July 16, 2020, filed by MNX, Inc. (Mitchell, Kurt) Modified text on 8/4/2020 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Return of Service Executed for Summons & Third Party Complaint, Exhibits served on Lanette Wichkam on July 16, 2020, filed by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 21 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Smith & Loveless, Inc. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Smith & Loveless, Inc.. filed by MNX, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #17 Stipulation. Defendant MNX, Inc, as a Third-Party Plaintiff, may serve a Summons and Third-Party Complaint on Smith and Loveless, Inc., a Kansas corporation. The Clerk of Court shall issue a Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/24/2020.(TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Allowing Service of a Third-Party Complaint #17 Stipulation. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Allow Service of a Third-Party Complaint by MNX, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff and Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 3/15/2021. Motions (disp) due by 8/10/2021. Ready for trial due by 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/11/2020.(TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2020. A scheduling order will issue. (TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff PKG Contracting, Inc.. (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. Jointly Signed by MNX, Inc..(Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant MNX, Inc. (Mitchell, Kurt) Modified text on 5/1/2020 (MKB). [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. MNX, Inc. answer due 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/22/2020.(TMA) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 16, 2020 *** Attorney Valerie Sims for PKG Contracting, Inc. added. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M Mitchell on behalf of MNX, Inc.. (Mitchell, Kurt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer by PKG Contracting, Inc.. Jointly Signed by MNX, Inc.. (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. MNX, Inc. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MNX, Inc. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-742 NEB/ECW. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MNX, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7568131) filed by PKG Contracting, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansmeier, Gordon) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PKG Contracting, Inc. v. MNX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Loveless Inc
Represented By: Dan C. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MNX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PKG Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Hansen
Represented By: Gordon H. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?