Goyal v. Bhardwaj et al
Plaintiff: Anoop Goyal
Defendant: Vedanta Telecom, LLC, Satish Bhardwaj and Seema Bhardwaj
Case Number: 2:2020cv02647
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gregorio Vincent Silva on behalf of Anoop Goyal. (Silva, Gregorio)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to March 5, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/21/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Haupt on behalf of Satish Bhardwaj, Seema Bhardwaj, Vedanta Telecom, LLC (Haupt, Robert)
January 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Satish Bhardwaj, Seema Bhardwaj, Vedanta Telecom, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Nelson, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Anoop Goyal upon Satish Bhardwaj served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021 (Jarrow, James)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Anoop Goyal upon Seema Bhardwaj served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021 (Jarrow, James)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Anoop Goyal upon Vedanta Telecom, LLC served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021 (Jarrow, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Anoop Goyal - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Jarrow, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Anoop Goyal. (Jarrow, James)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5360374.), filed by Anoop Goyal.(Jarrow, James)
December 21, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 21, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Satish Bhardwaj, Seema Bhardwaj, Vedanta Telecom, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goyal v. Bhardwaj et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vedanta Telecom, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B. Nelson
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satish Bhardwaj
Represented By: Christopher B. Nelson
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Bhardwaj
Represented By: Christopher B. Nelson
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anoop Goyal
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Represented By: Gregorio Vincent Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?