Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Makita U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Makita U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/04/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/3/21. (ks)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 7 days. Discovery deadline 8/17/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/31/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 01:30 PM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Mediation deadline 9/30/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 10/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL/KHV) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/3/21. (msb) Corrected trial date on 3/4/2021 (msb).
March 3, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Makita's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Makita U.S.A., Inc.. (Barton, Jonathan)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) The Reconvened Scheduling Conference has been rescheduled for 3/3/2021 at 03:00 PM via Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. (ht)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Following Scheduling Conference. Reconvened Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. The parties must submit their proposed revised schedule via email to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov by February 24, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/18/21. (ks)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Christina M. Wahl as to Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Wahl, Christina)
February 14, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Barton, Jonathan)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anooj M. Thakrar for Cincinnati Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only ; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jena M. Shillingburg for Cincinnati Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jena Shillingburg to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5409726.) by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ferguson, Mark)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Anooj M. Thakrar to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5409672.) by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ferguson, Mark)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cert of Service-Initial Disclosures by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Ferguson, Mark)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 03:30 PM via Telephone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 1/27/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/20/2021. (jal)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Thomas Barton on behalf of Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Barton, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wahl, Christina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Makita U.S.A., Inc. - the Civil Cover Sheet attached to the Notice of Removal entry contained fillable forms and was causing system errors when users attempted to view the documents. The fillable PDF was replaced with an identical non-fillable PDF which is also attached to this entry for service purposes. (cs)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition) by Makita U.S.A., Inc..(Wahl, Christina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice to State Court of Removal; Notice of Removal; Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal; and Defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement by Makita U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wahl, Christina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Makita U.S.A., Inc. identifying Makita Corporation as corporate parent (Wahl, Christina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of (Notice to Plaintiff of Removal) by Makita U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wahl, Christina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Leavenworth County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-000250 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5371218.), filed by Makita U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wahl, Christina) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/4/2021) (cs).
January 4, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Makita U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaylie E. Schmutz
Represented By: Mark A. Ferguson
Represented By: Anooj M. Thakrar
Represented By: Jena M. Shillingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Wahl
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Barton
Represented By: Christina Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?