Autoland Holdings, LLC v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Autoland Holdings, LLC a Kansas corporation doing business as Olathe Kia
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02132
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Bledsoe, Stephen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/14/2021 for Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/28/2021. (lb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Bledsoe on behalf of Kia Motors America, Inc. (Bledsoe, Stephen)
April 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kia Motors America, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Autoland Holdings, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Willnauer, Gary)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Autoland Holdings, LLC. (Willnauer, Gary)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Petitioner Autoland Holdings, LLC. (Willnauer, Gary) Modified petitioner's name on 3/18/2021 (ca).
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5440015.), filed by Autoland Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willnauer, Gary) Modified petitioner's name on 3/18/2021 (ca).
March 18, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autoland Holdings, LLC v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autoland Holdings, LLC a Kansas corporation doing business as Olathe Kia
Represented By: Gary J. Willnauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?