Koel v. Citizens Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RICKY KOEL
Defendant: SAM FUNK, DANIEL KUHLMAN, Citizens Medical Center Inc, ALEXANDRA KELLER, SAM RODGER FUNK, O.D., Citizens Medical Center Inc., Alexandra L. Keller, P.A., Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D. and Sam R. Funk, O.D., P.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02166
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sam R. Funk, O.D., P.A. identifying None as corporate parent . (Logback, Lawrence)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants dial 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 6/17/2021. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/20/2021. (ts)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Sam Rodger Funk, O.D., Sam R. Funk, O.D., P.A..(Logback, Lawrence)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Citizens Medical Center Inc., Alexandra L. Keller, P.A., Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D..(Wright, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/18/2021 for Defendants Alexandra L. Keller, P.A., Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D., Citizens Medical Center Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/4/2021. (lb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian C. Wright on behalf of Citizens Medical Center Inc., Alexandra L. Keller, P.A., Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D.. (Wright, Brian)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant RICKY KOEL. (Shelton, Michaela)
April 9, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
April 9, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citizens Medical Center Inc., Sam R. Funk, O.D., P.A., Alexandra L. Keller, P.A., Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
April 9, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sam Rodger Funk, O.D. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5457839.), filed by RICKY KOEL.(Shelton, Michaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koel v. Citizens Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM FUNK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL KUHLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA KELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM RODGER FUNK, O.D.
Represented By: Maureen Welsh
Represented By: Lawrence J. Logback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Medical Center Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra L. Keller, P.A.
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Kuhlman, M.D.
Represented By: Brian C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam R. Funk, O.D., P.A.
Represented By: Maureen Welsh
Represented By: Lawrence J. Logback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY KOEL
Represented By: Michaela Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?