Adkins v. Koduri
Plaintiff: Viola Adkins
Defendant: Vinaya Koduri
Case Number: 2:2021cv02206
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. The undersigned recommends Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/29/2021. Mailed to pro se party Viola Adkins by certified mail: Certified Tracking Number 70123460000082629284. (ts)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy by Plaintiff Viola Adkins. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(lb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Viola Adkins - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Viola Adkins. (lb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. Civil cover sheet is missing signature of plaintiff. Motion to proceed in forma pauperis with financial affidavit is missing. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to Viola Adkins by regular mail.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Viola Adkins. (lb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (titled: Writ of Mandamus)(No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Viola Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Appendix D, #4 Appendix E Redacted, #5 Envelope)(lb)
May 4, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Koduri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinaya Koduri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?