Starks v. Metro Men's Health, LLC
Plaintiff: Malcolm Starks
Defendant: Metro Men's Health, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02215
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Spencer D. Phillips for Defendant Metro Men's Health, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/6/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
July 5, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metro Men's Health, LLC identifying None as corporate parent of Defendant. (Galdean, Trinidad)
July 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Spencer D. Phillips to appear pro hac vice of Defendant ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5528797.) by Defendant Metro Men's Health, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Galdean, Trinidad)
July 5, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Metro Men's Health, LLC.(Galdean, Trinidad)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malcolm Starks. Metro Men's Health, LLC waiver sent on 5/12/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Thoenen, Brad)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Malcolm Starks. (Thoenen, Brad)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5483502.), filed by Malcolm Starks.(Thoenen, Brad)
May 10, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starks v. Metro Men's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Starks
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Men's Health, LLC
Represented By: Spencer D. Phillips
Represented By: Trinidad P. Galdean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?