Harris v. City Cycle Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeremy Leon Harris
Defendant: City Cycle Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02264
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/2/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/2/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/28/21. (ss)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by City Cycle Sales, Inc..(Sheppeard, Cynthia)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/21/2021 for Defendant City Cycle Sales, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/6/2021. (lb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 CITY CYCLE SALES, INC. SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jeremy Leon Harris upon City Cycle Sales, Inc. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021 (Rowe, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Leon Harris - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Rowe, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jeremy Leon Harris. (Rowe, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5509575.), filed by Jeremy Leon Harris.(Rowe, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Cycle Sales, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
June 10, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. City Cycle Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Cycle Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia J. Sheppeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Leon Harris
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kopp
Represented By: R. Douglas Gentile
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Rowe
Represented By: Rachel Nelson Boden
Represented By: Thomas J. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?