Barnett v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Cecil D. Barnett
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2021cv02279
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of answer due 10/26/2021. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/19/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
July 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On July 9, 2021, Kilolo Kijakazi was named acting Commissioner of Social Security replacing Andrew M. Saul. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, has been updated to reflect this change. (msb)
June 24, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (lb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5518314.), filed by Cecil D. Barnett. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVERSHEET)(Green, James)
June 21, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil D. Barnett
Represented By: James H. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?