C.C. v. Med-Data Incorporated
Plaintiff: C.C.
Defendant: Med-Data Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv02301
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidential Information. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/1/21. (adc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion to keep her identify private. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/20/21. (adc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. A status conference was held 8/20/21. Plaintiff did not appear. Defendant appeared through counsel, Theodore Kardis and Jesse Gray. After discussion of scheduling and of Plaintiff's pending motion to keep her identify private (ECF No. 8), the Court enters the following orders: Scheduling and discovery are hereby stayed pending resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 14). In the event this matter proceeds following a decision on the dispositive motion, an initial order setting planning and disclosure deadlines will be entered expeditiously. Given Defendant's lack of opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Keep the Identity of Plaintiff Private (ECF No. 8), the motion will be granted in large part by separate order. The parties are expected to confer, using the D. Kan. guidelines, to prepare a proposed Protective Order to address other ways Plaintiff's identity may be protected while permitting Defendant the ability to access her identity in its defense of this matter. Such proposed protective order must be submitted to the undersigned by 8/31/21. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/20/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jesse J. Gray for Med-Data Incorporated pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/20/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
August 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Jesse J. Gray to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5566375.) by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form) (Kardis, Theodore) Modified to add corrected ECF form on 8/20/2021. (gw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2021: #2 Corrected ECF Form) (gw).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Response deadline extended to 9/20/2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff C.C. (Brady, Maureen)
August 11, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #14 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(adc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 using ACCESS CODE 9686294. Counsel must be prepared to discuss whether to move forward with scheduling in light of the pending dispositive motion (ECF No. 14), and to discuss the pending motion to keep the identity of Plaintiff private (ECF No. 8). (adc)
August 5, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated(Kardis, Theodore)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated (Kardis, Theodore)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B)(Kardis, Theodore)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/22/2021. (hw)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Med-Data Incorporation shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 8/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated(Kardis, Theodore)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Keep the Identity of Plaintiff Private (Filed in Johnson County District Court on 4/2/2021; See Doc #1 for pleading) by Plaintiff C.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (hw)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service by Med-Data Incorporated. (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Med-Data Incorporated identifying FH MD Holdings, LLC as corporate parent . (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Med-Data Incorporated. (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Theodore A. Kardis on behalf of Med-Data Incorporated. (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Med-Data Incorporated. (Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, case number 21CV01716 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5531877.), filed by Med-Data Incorporated.(Kardis, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.C. v. Med-Data Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.
Represented By: Lucy McShane
Represented By: Maureen M. Brady
Represented By: Mitchell L. Burgess
Represented By: Phyllis A. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Data Incorporated
Represented By: Theodore A. Kardis
Represented By: Jesse J. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?