Bullock v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda L. Bullock
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02354
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Linda L. Bullock upon Walmart, Inc. served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021 (Barr, William)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/14/21. (ala) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2021: #1 Corrected Main Document) (ala).
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Henderson, William)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Henderson, William)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Linda L. Bullock. (Barr, William)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5562784.), filed by Linda L. Bullock.(Barr, William)
August 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Bullock
Represented By: William LeFevre Barr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Anna M. Berman
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Represented By: William H. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?