Burkhart v. Sodexo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kellie Burkhart
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc. and SDH Services West, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02411
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 02:30 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/14/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/28/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/28/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 12/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/16/2021. (ht)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SDH Services West, LLC, Sodexo, Inc. identifying Sodexo Operations, LLC. as corporate parent (Coughlin, AnnRene)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by SDH Services West, LLC, Sodexo, Inc..(Coughlin, AnnRene)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sodexo, Inc.and SDH Services West, LLC, filed by Kellie Burkhart.(Koc, Kevin) Modified on 10/19/2021 to added new party (hw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 (PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DE #10 FOR CORRECT FILING) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kellie Burkhart, filed by Kellie Burkhart.(Koc, Kevin) Modified on 10/19/2021 (hw).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 plaintiff Kellie Burkhart's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is entitled to amend her complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1), therefore leave of court is not required. Plaintiff must file her Amended Complaint by October 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/18/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kks)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/01/2021 for Defendant Sodexo, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/15/2021. (lb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff Kellie Burkhart (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Koc, Kevin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #4 : updated docket text to reflect service and answer date. (kas)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kellie Burkhart upon Sodexo, Inc. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Koc, Kevin) Modified on 9/30/2021 to update docket text with service and answer date(kas).
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 (DISREGARD - PLEASE SEE DE 4 FOR CORRECTED FILING) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Kellie Burkhart upon Sodexo, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021 (Koc, Kevin) Modified on 9/30/2021 (kas).
September 23, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sodexo, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kellie Burkhart. (Koc, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5592195.), filed by Kellie Burkhart.(Koc, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhart v. Sodexo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Burkhart
Represented By: Kevin C. Koc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By: AnnRene Sarah Coughlin
Represented By: Stacy Murrow Bunck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDH Services West, LLC
Represented By: AnnRene Sarah Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?