Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association v. Mead et al
Plaintiff: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Denise L. Mead, John Doe, Mary Doe, Unknown spouse, if any, of Denise L. Mead, State of Kansas, Department of Revenue and United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv02497
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Denise L. Mead re: #20 Motion for Sanctions. (ca)
December 10, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association re #20 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Meyer, William)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (ca)
December 3, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Denise L. Mead re: #9 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (ca)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of 10CCA DISMISSING APPEAL as to #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Denise L. Mead. (Appeal No. 21-3211) (heo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 11/18/2021 and assigned Appeal No. 21-3211 re #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Denise L. Mead. (ca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association re #12 Motion to Strike #3 Attorney's Motion to Remand. (Meyer, William) Modified on 12/2/2021 to re-title, originally filed as a response. (mam)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet)(ca)
November 18, 2021 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION) (ca)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #10 Order by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (Attachment: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(msb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Defendant Denise L. Mead as to #10 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Denise Mead, #2 Exhibit B - Court Order Docket Entry 10, #3 Fax Cover Sheet)(msb)
November 17, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #12 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Denise Mead, #2 Fax Cover Sheet)(msb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association re #9 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Meyer, William)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Defendant Mead must file her response to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court on or before November 24, 2021. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, no later than 14 days after Defendant's response. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 11/12/21. Mailed to pro se party Denise L. Mead. by regular mail (msb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Response deadline 12/2/2021) by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (mls)
November 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Permanent Injunction while the dispute is pending in federal court (Response deadline 11/26/2021) by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (mls)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Denise L. Mead.(ca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL (document entitled, "Notice of Removal to the United States Federal Court In Topeka Kansas") filed by Defendant Denise L. Mead - trial to be held in Topeka. (jsh)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association re #4 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Order of Sale, Notice of Sale), #2 Exhibit 2 (Summary Judgment Ruling), #3 Exhibit 3 (Journal Entry), #4 Exhibit 4 (Journal Entry))(Meyer, William)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Denise L. Mead (ca)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meyer, William)
October 29, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402, receipt number K4631060226. (lb)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Denise L. Mead. (lb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Douglas County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000294. Trial location of Kansas City, filed by Denise L. Mead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association v. Mead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-3, U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L. Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown spouse, if any, of Denise L. Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kansas, Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?