Vogel v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Vogel
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02511
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding #6 Plaintiff's Response to the Show-Cause Order. The court previously ordered plaintiff to show cause why the magistrate judge should not recommend that this case be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction because the complaint did not establish diversity of citizenship. Plaintiff's response to the show-cause order and newly filed amended complaint now adequately allege plaintiff's own citizenship. As such, plaintiff has pleaded facts sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction, and therefore the court will not recommend dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel(Scearcy, Nathaniel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Scearcy on behalf of Carrie Vogel. (Scearcy, Nathaniel)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must show cause in writing by November 19, 2021, why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/5/21. (kks)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel. (Sifers, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5628102.), filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Vogel
Represented By: Nathaniel Scearcy
Represented By: Timothy L. Sifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?