Shadravan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Arash Shadravan
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services National Benefits Center, Director of
Case Number: 2:2021cv02593
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/11/2022 for Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services National Benefits Center, Director of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/7/2022. (lb)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/14/2022 for Defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/7/2022. (lb)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 12/27/2021 United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/28/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services National Benefits Center, Director of served on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of served on 12/28/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipts)(Hacking, James)
December 23, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services National Benefits Center, Director of, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (lb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Arash Shadravan - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hacking, James)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Arash Shadravan. (Hacking, James)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5669754.), filed by Arash Shadravan.(Hacking, James)
December 22, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shadravan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arash Shadravan
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services National Benefits Center, Director of
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?